Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2792 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Darby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 2792
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot project to provide emergency telemedicine
 medical services and telehealth services in rural areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 771, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter F to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F. NEXT GENERATION 9-1-1 TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL SERVICES
 AND TELEHEALTH SERVICES PILOT PROJECT
 Sec. 771.151.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Center" means the area health education center at
 the Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center that meets the
 requirements of 42 U.S.C. Section 294a and has been awarded federal
 funding as an area health education center.
 (2)  "Emergency medical services" means services used
 to respond to an individual's perceived need for immediate medical
 care and to prevent death or aggravation of physiological or
 psychological illness or injury.
 (3)  "Emergency medical services provider" means a
 person who uses or maintains emergency medical services vehicles,
 medical equipment, and emergency medical services personnel to
 provide emergency medical services.
 (4)  "Emergency prehospital care" means care provided
 to a sick or injured individual before or during transportation of
 the individual to a medical facility, and includes any necessary
 stabilization of the individual in connection with that
 transportation.
 (5)  "Pilot project" means a pilot project established
 under Section 771.152.
 (6)  "Regional trauma resource center" means a trauma
 facility the center selects to participate in the pilot project.
 (7)  "Rural area" means:
 (A)  a county with a population of 50,000 or less;
 or
 (B)  a large, isolated, and sparsely populated
 area of a county with a population of more than 50,000.
 (8)  "Telehealth service" and "telemedicine medical
 service" have the meanings assigned by Section 111.001, Occupations
 Code.
 (9)  "Trauma facility" means a health care facility
 equipped and staffed to provide comprehensive treatment of
 seriously injured individuals as part of an emergency medical
 services and trauma care system.
 Sec. 771.152.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROJECT. (a) The
 commission, with the assistance of the center, shall establish a
 pilot project to provide emergency medical services instruction and
 emergency prehospital care instruction through a telemedicine
 medical service or telehealth service provided by regional trauma
 resource centers to:
 (1)  health care providers in rural area trauma
 facilities; and
 (2)  emergency medical services providers in rural
 areas.
 (b)  The commission shall provide technical assistance to
 the center in implementing the pilot project.
 (c)  The center, with the assistance of the commission,
 shall:
 (1)  design criteria and protocols for each
 telemedicine medical service or telehealth service offered and the
 related instruction and provide the oversight necessary to conduct
 the pilot project;
 (2)  define criteria to determine when a telemedicine
 medical service or telehealth service that provides instruction for
 emergency medical services, emergency prehospital care, and trauma
 care should be transferred to an emergency medical resource center
 for intervention; and
 (3)  collect the data necessary to evaluate the
 project.
 (d)  The center may make available appropriate resources for
 individuals who do not speak English.
 Sec. 771.153.  PERSONNEL. The center shall provide the
 telemedicine medical service or telehealth service and related
 instruction for the pilot project through health care providers in
 regional trauma resource centers, including physicians,
 pharmacists, emergency medical personnel, and other health
 professionals.
 Sec. 771.154.  PARTICIPATION IN PILOT PROJECT. (a) The
 center shall determine the trauma facilities and emergency medical
 services providers interested in participating in the pilot
 project.
 (b)  A trauma facility or emergency medical services
 provider participating in the pilot project must agree to
 successfully complete any required training and to provide all
 reports required by the center for the project.
 Sec. 771.155.  SELECTION OF PROJECT PARTICIPANTS AND
 REGIONAL TRAUMA RESOURCE CENTERS. (a) The center, with the
 assistance of the commission, may select trauma facilities and
 emergency medical services providers to participate in the pilot
 project and select trauma facilities to serve as regional trauma
 resource centers.
 (b)  The center may not select a trauma facility to
 participate in the pilot project or to serve as a regional trauma
 resource center unless the facility:
 (1)  has a quality assurance program that measures each
 health care provider's compliance with the medical protocol;
 (2)  uses emergency medical services and emergency
 prehospital care protocols approved by a physician medical director
 knowledgeable in emergency medical services and emergency
 prehospital care;
 (3)  has experience in providing emergency medical
 services and emergency prehospital care that the center determines
 is sufficient; and
 (4)  has resources sufficient to provide the additional
 telemedicine medical services or telehealth services and related
 instruction required for the project in addition to the health care
 services already provided by the facility.
 (c)  In selecting a trauma facility to serve as a regional
 trauma resource center, the center shall consider the facility
 personnel's ability to maintain records and produce reports to
 measure the effectiveness of the pilot project. The center shall
 share information regarding that ability with the commission.
 Sec. 771.156.  FUNDING OF PILOT PROJECT. (a) Money
 collected under Section 771.072(f) may be appropriated to the
 commission to fund the pilot project.
 (b)  The center may seek grants to fund the pilot project.
 (c)  A political subdivision with a trauma facility that
 participates in the pilot project may pay part of the costs of the
 project.
 (d)  If a sufficient number of political subdivisions in a
 region that may be served by the pilot project agree to pay the
 center an amount that together with other funding received under
 this section is sufficient to fund the project for the region, the
 center shall:
 (1)  contract with the political subdivisions for each
 to pay an appropriate share of the cost; and
 (2)  implement the project for the region when the
 amounts agreed to in the contracts and any other funding received
 under this section are sufficient to fund the project for the
 region.
 Sec. 771.157.  REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. The center, in
 cooperation with the commission, shall report its findings to the
 governor and the presiding officer of each house of the
 legislature, not later than December 31, 2026.
 Sec. 771.158.  LIABILITY. The operations of the center and a
 regional trauma resource center are considered to be the provision
 of 9-1-1 services for purposes of Section 771.053. Employees of and
 volunteers at the regional trauma resource center have the same
 protection from liability as a member of the governing body of a
 public agency under Section 771.053.
 Sec. 771.159.  WORK GROUP. (a) The center may appoint a
 project work group to assist the center in developing,
 implementing, and evaluating the pilot project and preparing a
 report on the center's findings.
 (b)  A member of the work group is not entitled to
 compensation for serving on the project work group and may not be
 reimbursed for travel or other expenses incurred while conducting
 the business of the project work group.
 (c)  The project work group is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 Sec. 771.160.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  Section 771.072(g), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding any other law, revenue derived from the
 equalization surcharge imposed under this section may be
 appropriated to the commission only for the purposes described by
 Section 771.156 and Sections 773.122 through 773.124.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *