Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2867 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021