1 | | - | By: Raymond, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 2867 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021; |
---|
3 | | - | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
4 | | - | Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | 87R17816 MCF-D |
---|
| 2 | + | By: Raymond, Guillen H.B. No. 2867 |
---|
7 | 3 | | |
---|
8 | 4 | | |
---|
9 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 7 | | relating to the issuance of a temporary license for an assisted |
---|
12 | 8 | | living facility that has a change in ownership. |
---|
13 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 247.021, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
15 | 11 | | amended by amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (i) to |
---|
16 | 12 | | read as follows: |
---|
17 | 13 | | (h) The commission shall [department may] automatically |
---|
18 | 14 | | issue a temporary [provisional] license to an existing facility |
---|
19 | 15 | | licensed under this chapter that has [in the case of] a [corporate] |
---|
20 | 16 | | change of ownership [of a facility]. |
---|
21 | 17 | | (i) The commission may issue a temporary license under |
---|
22 | 18 | | Subsection (h) without conducting an inspection of the facility if |
---|
23 | 19 | | the commission determines an inspection is not necessary. |
---|
24 | 20 | | SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
25 | 21 | | of this Act, but not later than January 1, 2022, the executive |
---|
26 | 22 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
27 | 23 | | adopt rules necessary to implement this Act. |
---|
28 | 24 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|