Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2867 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Raymond, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 2867
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a temporary license for an assisted
 living facility that has a change in ownership.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 247.021, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (i) to
 read as follows:
 (h)  The commission shall [department may] automatically
 issue a temporary [provisional] license to an existing facility
 licensed under this chapter that has [in the case of] a [corporate]
 change of ownership [of a facility].
 (i)  The commission may issue a temporary license under
 Subsection (h) without conducting an inspection of the facility if
 the commission determines an inspection is not necessary.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, but not later than January 1, 2022, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *