1 | 1 | | 87R9574 CJC-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Cason H.B. No. 3000 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the repeal of the franchise tax; making an |
---|
8 | 8 | | appropriation. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed. |
---|
11 | 11 | | (b) A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax |
---|
12 | 12 | | imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2021, is not |
---|
13 | 13 | | required to file a franchise tax report or pay a tax on the taxable |
---|
14 | 14 | | entity's taxable margin for the period ending on that date. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (c) Chapter 171, Tax Code, as that chapter existed |
---|
16 | 16 | | immediately before its repeal by this Act, and Subtitle B, Title 2, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Tax Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, |
---|
18 | 18 | | redeterminations, and refunds of any tax due or collected under |
---|
19 | 19 | | Chapter 171 until barred by limitations. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (d) The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) the status of a taxable entity that has had its |
---|
22 | 22 | | corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of |
---|
23 | 23 | | organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate |
---|
24 | 24 | | charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a |
---|
25 | 25 | | receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) the ability of the comptroller of public accounts, |
---|
27 | 27 | | secretary of state, or attorney general to take action against a |
---|
28 | 28 | | taxable entity under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for |
---|
29 | 29 | | actions that took place before the repeal; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (3) the right of a taxable entity to contest a |
---|
31 | 31 | | forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under |
---|
32 | 32 | | Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the |
---|
34 | 34 | | comptroller of public accounts, in consultation with the |
---|
35 | 35 | | Legislative Budget Board, shall determine the total amount of |
---|
36 | 36 | | revenue anticipated to have been received by this state during the |
---|
37 | 37 | | state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2023, attributable to the |
---|
38 | 38 | | tax imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if that chapter were not |
---|
39 | 39 | | repealed. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) On January 1, 2022, the amount determined under |
---|
41 | 41 | | Subsection (a) of this section is appropriated from the economic |
---|
42 | 42 | | stabilization fund to the comptroller of public accounts for the |
---|
43 | 43 | | purpose of depositing that amount to the credit of the general |
---|
44 | 44 | | revenue fund as money available for use during the state fiscal |
---|
45 | 45 | | biennium ending August 31, 2023, to make expenditures previously |
---|
46 | 46 | | authorized by appropriations from general revenue for that state |
---|
47 | 47 | | fiscal biennium. |
---|
48 | 48 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2022, but only |
---|
49 | 49 | | if: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) this Act receives a vote of two-thirds of the |
---|
51 | 51 | | members present in each house of the legislature, as provided by |
---|
52 | 52 | | Section 49-g(m), Article III, Texas Constitution; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) the total amount of appropriations made by the |
---|
54 | 54 | | General Appropriations Act for the state fiscal biennium ending |
---|
55 | 55 | | August 31, 2023, is at least three percent less than the total |
---|
56 | 56 | | amount of appropriations made by the General Appropriations Act for |
---|
57 | 57 | | the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2021. |
---|