Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3000 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/05/2021

                            87R9574 CJC-D
 By: Cason H.B. No. 3000


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of the franchise tax; making an
 appropriation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed.
 (b)  A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax
 imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2021, is not
 required to file a franchise tax report or pay a tax on the taxable
 entity's taxable margin for the period ending on that date.
 (c)  Chapter 171, Tax Code, as that chapter existed
 immediately before its repeal by this Act, and Subtitle B, Title 2,
 Tax Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies,
 redeterminations, and refunds of any tax due or collected under
 Chapter 171 until barred by limitations.
 (d)  The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect:
 (1)  the status of a taxable entity that has had its
 corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of
 organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate
 charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a
 receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter;
 (2)  the ability of the comptroller of public accounts,
 secretary of state, or attorney general to take action against a
 taxable entity under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for
 actions that took place before the repeal; or
 (3)  the right of a taxable entity to contest a
 forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under
 Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
 comptroller of public accounts, in consultation with the
 Legislative Budget Board, shall determine the total amount of
 revenue anticipated to have been received by this state during the
 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2023, attributable to the
 tax imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if that chapter were not
 repealed.
 (b)  On January 1, 2022, the amount determined under
 Subsection (a) of this section is appropriated from the economic
 stabilization fund to the comptroller of public accounts for the
 purpose of depositing that amount to the credit of the general
 revenue fund as money available for use during the state fiscal
 biennium ending August 31, 2023, to make expenditures previously
 authorized by appropriations from general revenue for that state
 fiscal biennium.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022, but only
 if:
 (1)  this Act receives a vote of two-thirds of the
 members present in each house of the legislature, as provided by
 Section 49-g(m), Article III, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  the total amount of appropriations made by the
 General Appropriations Act for the state fiscal biennium ending
 August 31, 2023, is at least three percent less than the total
 amount of appropriations made by the General Appropriations Act for
 the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2021.