Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021