1 | | - | By: Shine (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3114 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
3 | | - | May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
4 | | - | Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | 87R10045 BDP-F |
---|
| 2 | + | By: Shine H.B. No. 3114 |
---|
7 | 3 | | |
---|
8 | 4 | | |
---|
9 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 7 | | relating to rules or procedures of the Commission on Jail Standards |
---|
12 | 8 | | regarding prisoner visitation. |
---|
13 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 511.009(a-1), Government Code, is |
---|
15 | 11 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 12 | | (a-1) A county jail that as of September 1, 2015, has |
---|
17 | 13 | | incurred significant design, engineering, or construction costs to |
---|
18 | 14 | | provide prisoner visitation that does not comply with a rule or |
---|
19 | 15 | | procedure adopted under Subsection (a)(20), or does not have the |
---|
20 | 16 | | physical plant capability to provide the in-person prisoner |
---|
21 | 17 | | visitation required by a rule or procedure adopted under Subsection |
---|
22 | 18 | | (a)(20), is not required to comply with any commission rule or |
---|
23 | 19 | | procedure adopted under Subsection (a)(20). Any addition to or |
---|
24 | 20 | | renovation of a county jail to which this subsection applies is not |
---|
25 | 21 | | required to comply with any commission rule or procedure adopted |
---|
26 | 22 | | under Subsection (a)(20). |
---|
27 | 23 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|