Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3114 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Shine (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3114
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rules or procedures of the Commission on Jail Standards
 regarding prisoner visitation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 511.009(a-1), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A county jail that as of September 1, 2015, has
 incurred significant design, engineering, or construction costs to
 provide prisoner visitation that does not comply with a rule or
 procedure adopted under Subsection (a)(20), or does not have the
 physical plant capability to provide the in-person prisoner
 visitation required by a rule or procedure adopted under Subsection
 (a)(20), is not required to comply with any commission rule or
 procedure adopted under Subsection (a)(20). Any addition to or
 renovation of a county jail to which this subsection applies is not
 required to comply with any commission rule or procedure adopted
 under Subsection (a)(20).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *