Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Record vote RV#953
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Clardy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Clardy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 2-Beckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Amended 1-Parker
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Postponed 5/8/21 9:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Postponed 5/7/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Postponed 5/6/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|