Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3276 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3276
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3276 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the security of voted ballots.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 65, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 65.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 65.016.  VIDEO RECORDING OF COUNTING LOCATIONS. (a)
 This section applies to:
 (1)  a primary election;
 (2)  the general election for state and county
 officers; and
 (3)  an election in which the county clerk serves as the
 early voting clerk.
 (b)  The general custodian of election records shall
 implement a video surveillance system that retains a record of all
 areas containing voted ballots from the time the ballots are
 delivered to the general custodian of election records until the
 canvass of precinct election returns.  The video recording shall be
 retained in the same manner as a precinct election record under
 Section 66.058.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (e), the general custodian of
 election records shall provide a live video stream of any election
 activity recorded under Subsection (b) on the Internet website of
 the authority administering the election.
 (d)  The secretary of state shall prescribe procedures
 necessary for the implementation of this section.
 (e)  The general custodian of election records in a county
 with a population of less than 100,000 may, but is not required to,
 comply with the live video stream requirement under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.009, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  If state funds are made available to provide for the
 security of voted ballots under Section 65.016, the secretary of
 state shall administer and distribute the funds to counties as
 appropriate to most effectively facilitate the purpose for which
 the funds are made available.
 (c)  The secretary of state shall prescribe any necessary
 rules and take any appropriate action to implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.0112 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.0112.  VIDEO RECORDING OF COUNTING LOCATIONS FUND.
 (a) The video recording of counting locations fund is an account in
 the general fund.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall establish a grant program
 to assist counties with the implementation of this section.
 (c)  If a federal program makes funding available to this
 state for the purpose of video recording of ballot counting
 locations, state funds appropriated under this section may be used
 to meet federal matching requirements under the federal program.
 (d)  The fund is exempt from the application of Section
 403.095, Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  The governing body of a political subdivision is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the governing body may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *