Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021