Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021