Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB363 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/10/2021

                            By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 363
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 10, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restricting the use of personally identifiable student
 information by an operator of a website, online service, online
 application, or mobile application used for a school purpose and
 providing an exemption from certain restrictions for a national
 assessment provider.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 32.155, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 32.155.  PROTECTION OF COVERED INFORMATION. (a) An
 operator must implement and maintain reasonable security
 procedures and practices designed to protect any covered
 information from unauthorized access, deletion, use, modification,
 or disclosure.
 (b)  Any operator that has been approved by the agency or had
 a product adopted by the agency and possesses any covered
 information must use the unique identifier established by the Texas
 Student Data System (TSDS) or a successor data management system
 maintained by the agency for any account creation, data upload,
 data transmission, analysis, or reporting to mask all personally
 identifiable student information. The operator shall adhere to a
 state-required student data sharing agreement that includes an
 established unique identifier standard for all operators as
 prescribed by the agency.
 (c)  In addition to including the unique identifier in
 releasing information as provided by Subsection (b), an operator
 may include any other data field identified by the agency or by a
 school district, open-enrollment charter school, regional
 education service center, or other local education agency as
 necessary for the information being released to be useful.
 (d)  A school district, open-enrollment charter school,
 regional education service center, or other local education agency
 may include additional data fields in an agreement with an operator
 or the amendment of an agreement with an operator under this
 section. An operator may agree to include the additional data
 fields requested by a school district, open-enrollment charter
 school, regional education service center, or other local education
 agency but may not require that additional data fields be included.
 (e)  A school district, open-enrollment charter school,
 regional education service center, or other local education agency
 may require an operator that contracts directly with the entity to
 adhere to a state-required student data sharing agreement that
 includes the use of an established unique identifier standard for
 all operators as prescribed by the agency.
 (f)  A national assessment provider who receives covered
 information from a student or from a school district or campus on
 behalf of a student is not required to comply with Subsection (b) or
 (e) if the provider receives the covered information solely to
 provide access to:
 (1)  employment, educational scholarships, financial
 aid, or postsecondary educational opportunities; or
 (2)  educational resources for middle school, junior
 high school, or high school students.
 (g)  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 administer this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *