Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4296 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            By: Burns (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 4296
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of dyed diesel fuel to operate a motor vehicle
 during and for a limited period following certain disasters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 162.235, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a person who purchases
 dyed motor fuel and furnishes to the licensed supplier or
 distributor under Section 162.206(a) a signed statement that
 includes an end user number issued by the comptroller may operate a
 motor vehicle on a public highway in this state with that dyed motor
 fuel in the fuel supply tank of the motor vehicle during a period
 beginning on the date a state of disaster is declared under Section
 418.014, Government Code, due to a fire, flood, earthquake,
 tornado, hurricane, storm, or energy emergency and ending on the
 30th day after the declaration expires or otherwise terminates, if
 the motor vehicle is operated:
 (1)  in the area designated a disaster area by the
 disaster declaration; or
 (2)  in an area other than the area described by
 Subdivision (1) if the dyed motor fuel was placed in the fuel supply
 tank of the motor vehicle in the area described by that subdivision.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 Conduct that occurred before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, conduct occurred before the effective
 date of this Act if any element of the conduct occurred before that
 date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *