Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021