Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4305 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            By: Morales of Maverick, et al. H.B. No. 4305
 (Senate Sponsor - Blanco)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 24, 2021, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4305 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain tax revenue by certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1016.  CERTAIN QUALIFIED PROJECTS IN BORDER
 MUNICIPALITIES. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Base year amount" means the amount of
 hotel-associated revenue collected in a project financing zone
 during the calendar year in which a municipality designates the
 zone.
 (2)  "Hotel-associated revenue" means the sum of:
 (A)  state tax revenue collected in a project
 financing zone from all hotels located in the zone that would be
 available to the owners of qualified hotel projects under Section
 151.429(h) if the hotels were qualified hotel projects; and
 (B)  tax revenue collected from all permittees
 under Chapter 183 at hotels located in the zone, excluding revenue
 disbursed by the comptroller under Section 183.051(b).
 (3)  "Incremental hotel-associated revenue" means the
 amount in any calendar year by which hotel-associated revenue,
 including hotel-associated revenue from hotels built in the project
 financing zone after the year in which a municipality designates
 the zone, exceeds the base year amount.
 (4)  "Project financing zone" means an area within a
 municipality:
 (A)  that the municipality by ordinance or by
 agreement under Chapter 380, Local Government Code, designates as a
 project financing zone;
 (B)  the boundaries of which are within a one-mile
 radius of the center of a qualified project;
 (C)  the designation of which specifies the
 longitude and latitude of the center of the qualified project;
 (D)  the designation of which expires not later
 than the 15th anniversary of the date of designation; and
 (E)  all or part of which is located in an area
 designated as a qualified opportunity zone under Section 1400Z-1,
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 (5)  "Qualified project" means:
 (A)  a venue that is:
 (i)  located on land owned by a
 municipality, another governmental entity, or the owner of the
 venue;
 (ii)  partially financed by private
 contributions that equal not less than 40 percent of the project
 costs; and
 (iii)  related to the promotion of tourism
 and the convention and hotel industry; or
 (B)  towers and other facilities used by hotel
 guests and tourists to observe spacecraft and spaceport activities
 and learn about spacecraft and spaceport operations and launches.
 (6)  "Spacecraft" and "spaceport" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 507.001, Local Government Code.
 (7)  "Venue" has the meaning assigned by Section
 334.001, Local Government Code.
 (b)  This section applies only to a qualified project located
 in a municipality that is the county seat of a county bordering the
 Gulf of Mexico and the United Mexican States.
 (c)  In addition to the uses provided by Section 351.101,
 revenue from the municipal hotel occupancy tax may be used to fund a
 qualified project.
 (d)  A municipality may pledge the revenue derived from the
 tax imposed under this chapter from a hotel located in the project
 financing zone for the payment of bonds or other obligations issued
 or incurred to acquire, lease, construct, improve, enlarge, equip,
 operate, maintain, and repair the qualified project or to acquire
 real property on which the qualified project is located.
 (e)  A municipality may pledge for the payment of bonds or
 other obligations described by Subsection (d) the local revenue
 from eligible taxable proceeds as defined by Section 2303.5055(e),
 Government Code, from hotels located in a project financing zone
 that would be available to the owners of qualified hotel projects
 under that section if the hotels were qualified hotel projects.
 (f)  A municipality shall notify the comptroller of the
 municipality's designation of a project financing zone not later
 than the 30th day after the date the municipality designates the
 zone.  Notwithstanding other law, the municipality is entitled to
 receive the incremental hotel-associated revenue from the project
 financing zone for the period beginning on the first day of the year
 after the year in which the municipality designates the zone and
 ending on the last day of the month during which the designation
 expires.  The municipality may pledge the revenue for the payment of
 bonds or other obligations described by Subsection (d).
 (g)  The comptroller shall deposit incremental
 hotel-associated revenue collected by or forwarded to the
 comptroller in a separate suspense account to be held in trust for
 the municipality that is entitled to receive the revenue. The
 suspense account is outside the state treasury, and the comptroller
 may make a payment authorized by this section from the account
 without the necessity of an appropriation. The comptroller shall
 begin making payments from the suspense account to the municipality
 for which the money is held on the date the qualified project in the
 project financing zone is commenced.  If the qualified project is
 not commenced by the fifth anniversary of the first deposit to the
 account, the comptroller shall transfer the money in the account to
 the general revenue fund and cease making deposits to the account.
 (h)  The comptroller may estimate the amount of incremental
 hotel-associated revenue that will be deposited to a suspense
 account under Subsection (g) during each calendar year. The
 comptroller may make deposits to the account and the municipality
 may request disbursements from the account on a monthly basis based
 on the estimate. At the end of each calendar year, the comptroller
 shall adjust the deposits and disbursements to reflect the amount
 of revenue actually deposited to the account during the calendar
 year.
 (i)  A municipality shall notify the comptroller if the
 qualified project in the project financing zone is abandoned.  If
 the qualified project is abandoned, the comptroller shall transfer
 to the general revenue fund the amount of money in the suspense
 account that exceeds the amount required for the payment of bonds or
 other obligations described by Subsection (d).
 SECTION 2.  Section 351.10692(a), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a municipality with a population of less than
 2,000 located in a county that:
 (A) [(1)]  is adjacent to the county in which the
 State Capitol is located; and
 (B) [(2)]  has a population of:
 (i) [(A)]  not more than 25,000; or
 (ii) [(B)]  at least 100,000 but not more
 than 200,000;
 (2)  a municipality located in a county with a total
 area of more than 2,200 square miles but less than 2,350 square
 miles; and
 (3)  a municipality located in a county with a total
 area of more than 3,850 square miles but less than 4,000 square
 miles that is not the county seat.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *