Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021