Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021