1 | | - | By: Shaheen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 460 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
3 | | - | May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
4 | | - | Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | 87R165 MAW-D |
---|
| 2 | + | By: Shaheen, Noble, Harless, H.B. No. 460 |
---|
| 3 | + | Morales of Maverick, Minjarez |
---|
7 | 4 | | |
---|
8 | 5 | | |
---|
9 | 6 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 7 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 8 | | relating to the solicitation of pen pals by certain inmates of the |
---|
12 | 9 | | Texas Department of Criminal Justice. |
---|
13 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 500, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
15 | 12 | | adding Section 500.009 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 13 | | Sec. 500.009. PEN PAL SOLICITATION PROHIBITED. (a) This |
---|
17 | 14 | | section applies only to an inmate confined in a facility operated by |
---|
18 | 15 | | or under contract with the department who is serving a sentence for |
---|
19 | 16 | | an offense for which registration as a sex offender is required |
---|
20 | 17 | | under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure. |
---|
21 | 18 | | (b) The department shall adopt a policy that prohibits an |
---|
22 | 19 | | inmate described by Subsection (a) from placing an advertisement |
---|
23 | 20 | | soliciting a pen pal on an Internet website operated for that |
---|
24 | 21 | | purpose, regardless of whether another person submits or pays for |
---|
25 | 22 | | the advertisement for the inmate. |
---|
26 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas |
---|
27 | 24 | | Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt the policy required by |
---|
28 | 25 | | Section 500.009, Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
29 | 26 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|