Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB460 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Shaheen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 460
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the solicitation of pen pals by certain inmates of the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 500, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 500.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 500.009.  PEN PAL SOLICITATION PROHIBITED. (a) This
 section applies only to an inmate confined in a facility operated by
 or under contract with the department who is serving a sentence for
 an offense for which registration as a sex offender is required
 under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (b)  The department shall adopt a policy that prohibits an
 inmate described by Subsection (a) from placing an advertisement
 soliciting a pen pal on an Internet website operated for that
 purpose, regardless of whether another person submits or pays for
 the advertisement for the inmate.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt the policy required by
 Section 500.009, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *