Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB53 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021