Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB53 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Fierro (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 53
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 April 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of April as Parkinson's Disease
 Awareness Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.114 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.114.  PARKINSON'S DISEASE AWARENESS MONTH.  (a)
 April is Parkinson's Disease Awareness Month to increase awareness
 of Parkinson's disease and to encourage people to learn about the
 signs, symptoms, and treatment options for Parkinson's disease.
 (b)  Parkinson's Disease Awareness Month may be regularly
 observed through appropriate programs and activities to increase
 awareness of Parkinson's disease.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *