Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Record vote RV#526
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|