Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021