Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB548 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Frank, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 548
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 548 By:  Blanco


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the temporary licensing of certain military veterans as
 health care providers to practice in underserved areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 155, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 155.108 to read as follows:
 Sec. 155.108.  TEMPORARY LICENSE FOR MILITARY VETERAN TO
 PRACTICE IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a) In this section, "active duty" and
 "armed forces of the United States" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 55.001.
 (b)  The board shall issue a temporary license to practice
 medicine in a location described by Subsection (e) to an applicant
 who:
 (1)  is licensed in good standing as a physician in
 another state;
 (2)  is a veteran of the armed forces of the United
 States who retired from or otherwise left military service not more
 than one year before the application date for a license under this
 section; and
 (3)  was, at the time of retiring from or leaving
 military service:
 (A)  serving on active duty in this state; and
 (B)  authorized as a physician to treat persons
 enlisted in the armed forces of the United States or veterans.
 (c)  An applicant for a license under this section is not
 required to have passed the Texas medical jurisprudence
 examination.
 (d)  The board may not issue a license under this section to
 an applicant who:
 (1)  was discharged or separated from the armed forces
 of the United States:
 (A)  on the basis of substandard conduct; or
 (B)  for any act of misconduct or moral or
 professional dereliction;
 (2)  holds a medical license or a license to prescribe,
 dispense, administer, supply, or sell a controlled substance that:
 (A)  is currently under active investigation; or
 (B)  is or was subject to a disciplinary order or
 action or to denial by any jurisdiction; or
 (3)  has been convicted of, is on deferred adjudication
 community supervision or deferred disposition for, or is under
 active investigation for the commission of:
 (A)  a felony; or
 (B)  a misdemeanor involving moral turpitude.
 (e)  A physician licensed under this section may practice
 only in:
 (1)  a health professional shortage area, as defined by
 Section 157.051; or
 (2)  a medically underserved community, as defined by
 Section 487.201, Government Code.
 (f)  A license issued under this section:
 (1)  expires 18 months after the date the license was
 issued; and
 (2)  may not be renewed.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.262 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.262.  TEMPORARY LICENSE FOR MILITARY VETERAN TO
 PRACTICE IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a) In this section, "active duty" and
 "armed forces of the United States" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 55.001.
 (b)  The board shall issue a temporary license to practice
 nursing in a location described by Subsection (e) to an applicant
 who:
 (1)  is licensed in good standing as a nurse in another
 state;
 (2)  is a veteran of the armed forces of the United
 States who retired from or otherwise left military service not more
 than one year before the application date for a license under this
 section; and
 (3)  was, at the time of retiring from or otherwise
 leaving military service:
 (A)  serving on active duty in this state; and
 (B)  authorized as a nurse to treat persons
 enlisted in the armed forces of the United States or veterans.
 (c)  An applicant for a license under this section is not
 required to have passed the jurisprudence examination.
 (d)  The board may not issue a license under this section to
 an applicant who:
 (1)  was discharged or separated from the armed forces
 of the United States:
 (A)  on the basis of substandard conduct; or
 (B)  for any act of misconduct or moral or
 professional dereliction;
 (2)  holds a nursing license or a license to prescribe,
 dispense, administer, supply, or sell a controlled substance that:
 (A)  is currently under active investigation; or
 (B)  is or was subject to a disciplinary order or
 action or to denial by any jurisdiction; or
 (3)  has been convicted of, is on deferred adjudication
 community supervision or deferred disposition for, or is under
 active investigation for the commission of:
 (A)  a felony; or
 (B)  a misdemeanor involving moral turpitude.
 (e)  A nurse licensed under this section may practice only
 in:
 (1)  a health professional shortage area, as defined by
 Section 157.051; or
 (2)  a medically underserved community, as defined by
 Section 487.201, Government Code.
 (f)  A license issued under this section:
 (1)  expires 18 months after the date the license was
 issued; and
 (2)  may not be renewed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *