Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021