Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 29, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021