1 | | - | H.B. No. 900 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Huberty (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 900 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the liability of a landlord for damages resulting from |
---|
6 | 12 | | the execution of a writ of possession in an eviction suit. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 24.0061, Property Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 15 | | adding Subsection (i) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (i) A landlord is not liable for damages to the tenant |
---|
11 | 17 | | resulting from the execution of a writ of possession by an officer |
---|
12 | 18 | | under this section. |
---|
13 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Section 24.0061(i), Property Code, as added by |
---|
14 | 20 | | this Act, applies only to the execution of a writ of possession |
---|
15 | 21 | | issued in an eviction suit filed on or after the effective date of |
---|
16 | 22 | | this Act. Execution of a writ of possession issued in an eviction |
---|
17 | 23 | | suit filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the |
---|
18 | 24 | | law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and |
---|
19 | 25 | | that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
20 | 26 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
21 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
22 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
23 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 900 was passed by the House on April |
---|
24 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, 2 present, not |
---|
25 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
26 | | - | H.B. No. 900 on May 27, 2021, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
27 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
28 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
29 | | - | on H.B. No. 900 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, |
---|
30 | | - | Nays 7, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 900 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
34 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays |
---|
35 | | - | 2; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
36 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
37 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
38 | | - | 900 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
41 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Date |
---|
43 | | - | __________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 27 | + | * * * * * |
---|