Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB900 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 900


 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of a landlord for damages resulting from
 the execution of a writ of possession in an eviction suit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.0061, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  A landlord is not liable for damages to the tenant
 resulting from the execution of a writ of possession by an officer
 under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.0061(i), Property Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to the execution of a writ of possession
 issued in an eviction suit filed on or after the effective date of
 this Act. Execution of a writ of possession issued in an eviction
 suit filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 900 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 2, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 900 on May 27, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 900 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 134,
 Nays 7, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 900 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays
 2; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 900 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor