Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021