|
06/14/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Record vote RV#1657
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Record vote RV#390
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended 1-C. Morales
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Placed on Resolutions Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|