LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
House
Bills
HCR51
Draft Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HCR51
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR51
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 2, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 22, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 29, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 21, 2021
Compare
Bill
March 30, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 20, 2021
Analysis
May 17, 2021