Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021