Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021