Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1132 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1132


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of crafted precious metal dealers;
 authorizing the change of a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1956.051, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subdivision (3) and adding Subdivision (5-a) to read as
 follows:
 (3)  "Crafted precious metal" means jewelry,
 silverware, an art object, or another object, made wholly or partly
 from precious metal and used primarily for personal, family, or
 household purchases. The term does not include:
 (A)  [, other than] a coin;
 (B)  [,] a bar;
 (C)  [,] a commemorative medallion;
 (D)  an item selling at 105 percent or more of[, or
 scrap or a broken item selling at five percent or more than] the
 scrap value of the item;
 (E)  an item made wholly or partly from precious
 metal and used for a dental, pharmaceutical, or medical
 application; or
 (F)  an item made wholly or partly from precious
 metal extracted, recovered, or salvaged from an industrial
 by-product or industrial waste product.
 (5-a)  "Jewelry store" means a retail establishment
 that derives 75 percent or more of its annual revenue from the sale
 to consumers of crafted precious metal or other items of personal
 adornment, including watches, bracelets, necklaces, brooches,
 rings, and earrings.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1956.0612(c), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The commissioner shall prescribe the processing fee in
 an amount necessary to cover the costs of administering this
 subchapter [section].
 SECTION 3.  Section 1956.0613, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1956.0613.  INVESTIGATION BY COMMISSIONER. The
 commissioner shall:
 (1)  monitor the operations of a dealer to ensure
 compliance with this subchapter [chapter]; and
 (2)  receive and investigate complaints against a
 dealer or a person acting as a dealer.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1956, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1956.06131 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1956.06131.  EXAMINATION BY COMMISSIONER. (a) At the
 times the commissioner considers necessary, the commissioner or the
 commissioner's representative may:
 (1)  examine each place of business of each dealer; and
 (2)  investigate the dealer's transactions and records,
 including books, accounts, papers, and correspondence, to the
 extent the transactions and records pertain to the business
 regulated under this subchapter.
 (b)  A dealer shall:
 (1)  give the commissioner or the commissioner's
 representative free access to the dealer's office, place of
 business, files, safes, and vaults; and
 (2)  allow the commissioner or the representative to
 make a copy of an item that may be investigated under Subsection
 (a)(2).
 (c)  The commissioner or the commissioner's representative
 shall examine under Subsection (a) at least 10 dealers each
 calendar year.
 (d)  This section does not apply with respect to a jewelry
 store.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1956, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1956.0616 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1956.0616.  NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT ORDER. (a) As soon
 as practicable after an enforcement order against a dealer for a
 violation of this subchapter becomes final, including an order
 assessing an administrative penalty or an order to pay restitution
 under Section 14.251(b)(3), Finance Code, the commissioner shall
 provide notice of the order to:
 (1)  the chief of police of the municipality in which
 the violation occurred; or
 (2)  the sheriff of the county in which the violation
 occurred, if the violation did not occur in a municipality.
 (b)  The notice must include:
 (1)  a copy of the enforcement order;
 (2)  the information on complaint procedures described
 by Section 14.062(b), Finance Code; and
 (3)  any other information the commissioner considers
 necessary or proper to the enforcement of this subchapter.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 1956.052, 1956.053, and 1956.054,
 Occupations Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 7.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 (b)  Section 1956.06131, Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, takes effect January 1, 2022.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1132 passed the Senate on
 April 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1132 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126,
 Nays 19, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor