Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1132 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1132
1+87R21672 MAW-F
2+ By: Johnson, et al. S.B. No. 1132
3+ (Turner of Dallas)
4+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1132: No.
25
36
7+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
48 AN ACT
59 relating to the regulation of crafted precious metal dealers;
610 authorizing the change of a fee.
711 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
812 SECTION 1. Section 1956.051, Occupations Code, is amended
913 by amending Subdivision (3) and adding Subdivision (5-a) to read as
1014 follows:
1115 (3) "Crafted precious metal" means jewelry,
1216 silverware, an art object, or another object, made wholly or partly
1317 from precious metal and used primarily for personal, family, or
1418 household purchases. The term does not include:
1519 (A) [, other than] a coin;
1620 (B) [,] a bar;
1721 (C) [,] a commemorative medallion;
1822 (D) an item selling at 105 percent or more of[, or
1923 scrap or a broken item selling at five percent or more than] the
2024 scrap value of the item;
2125 (E) an item made wholly or partly from precious
2226 metal and used for a dental, pharmaceutical, or medical
2327 application; or
2428 (F) an item made wholly or partly from precious
2529 metal extracted, recovered, or salvaged from an industrial
2630 by-product or industrial waste product.
2731 (5-a) "Jewelry store" means a retail establishment
2832 that derives 75 percent or more of its annual revenue from the sale
2933 to consumers of crafted precious metal or other items of personal
3034 adornment, including watches, bracelets, necklaces, brooches,
3135 rings, and earrings.
3236 SECTION 2. Section 1956.0612(c), Occupations Code, is
3337 amended to read as follows:
3438 (c) The commissioner shall prescribe the processing fee in
3539 an amount necessary to cover the costs of administering this
3640 subchapter [section].
3741 SECTION 3. Section 1956.0613, Occupations Code, is amended
3842 to read as follows:
3943 Sec. 1956.0613. INVESTIGATION BY COMMISSIONER. The
4044 commissioner shall:
4145 (1) monitor the operations of a dealer to ensure
4246 compliance with this subchapter [chapter]; and
4347 (2) receive and investigate complaints against a
4448 dealer or a person acting as a dealer.
4549 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 1956, Occupations Code, is
4650 amended by adding Section 1956.06131 to read as follows:
4751 Sec. 1956.06131. EXAMINATION BY COMMISSIONER. (a) At the
4852 times the commissioner considers necessary, the commissioner or the
4953 commissioner's representative may:
5054 (1) examine each place of business of each dealer; and
5155 (2) investigate the dealer's transactions and records,
5256 including books, accounts, papers, and correspondence, to the
5357 extent the transactions and records pertain to the business
5458 regulated under this subchapter.
5559 (b) A dealer shall:
5660 (1) give the commissioner or the commissioner's
5761 representative free access to the dealer's office, place of
5862 business, files, safes, and vaults; and
5963 (2) allow the commissioner or the representative to
6064 make a copy of an item that may be investigated under Subsection
6165 (a)(2).
6266 (c) The commissioner or the commissioner's representative
6367 shall examine under Subsection (a) at least 10 dealers each
6468 calendar year.
6569 (d) This section does not apply with respect to a jewelry
6670 store.
6771 SECTION 5. Subchapter B, Chapter 1956, Occupations Code, is
6872 amended by adding Section 1956.0616 to read as follows:
6973 Sec. 1956.0616. NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT ORDER. (a) As soon
7074 as practicable after an enforcement order against a dealer for a
7175 violation of this subchapter becomes final, including an order
7276 assessing an administrative penalty or an order to pay restitution
7377 under Section 14.251(b)(3), Finance Code, the commissioner shall
7478 provide notice of the order to:
7579 (1) the chief of police of the municipality in which
7680 the violation occurred; or
7781 (2) the sheriff of the county in which the violation
7882 occurred, if the violation did not occur in a municipality.
7983 (b) The notice must include:
8084 (1) a copy of the enforcement order;
8185 (2) the information on complaint procedures described
8286 by Section 14.062(b), Finance Code; and
8387 (3) any other information the commissioner considers
8488 necessary or proper to the enforcement of this subchapter.
8589 SECTION 6. Sections 1956.052, 1956.053, and 1956.054,
8690 Occupations Code, are repealed.
8791 SECTION 7. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
8892 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
8993 (b) Section 1956.06131, Occupations Code, as added by this
9094 Act, takes effect January 1, 2022.
91- ______________________________ ______________________________
92- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
93- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1132 passed the Senate on
94- April 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
95- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
96- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
97- ______________________________
98- Secretary of the Senate
99- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1132 passed the House, with
100- amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126,
101- Nays 19, two present not voting.
102- ______________________________
103- Chief Clerk of the House
104- Approved:
105- ______________________________
106- Date
107- ______________________________
108- Governor