|
06/16/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1769
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1377
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|