Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1164 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021