4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault. |
---|
6 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 22.011(b), Penal Code, is amended to |
---|
8 | 12 | | read as follows: |
---|
9 | 13 | | (b) A sexual assault under Subsection (a)(1) is without the |
---|
10 | 14 | | consent of the other person if: |
---|
11 | 15 | | (1) the actor compels the other person to submit or |
---|
12 | 16 | | participate by the use of physical force, violence, or coercion; |
---|
13 | 17 | | (2) the actor compels the other person to submit or |
---|
14 | 18 | | participate by threatening to use force or violence against the |
---|
15 | 19 | | other person or to cause harm to the other person, and the other |
---|
16 | 20 | | person believes that the actor has the present ability to execute |
---|
17 | 21 | | the threat; |
---|
18 | 22 | | (3) the other person has not consented and the actor |
---|
19 | 23 | | knows the other person is unconscious or physically unable to |
---|
20 | 24 | | resist; |
---|
21 | 25 | | (4) the actor knows that as a result of mental disease |
---|
22 | 26 | | or defect the other person is at the time of the sexual assault |
---|
23 | 27 | | incapable either of appraising the nature of the act or of resisting |
---|
24 | 28 | | it; |
---|
25 | 29 | | (5) the other person has not consented and the actor |
---|
26 | 30 | | knows the other person is unaware that the sexual assault is |
---|
27 | 31 | | occurring; |
---|
28 | 32 | | (6) the actor has intentionally impaired the other |
---|
29 | 33 | | person's power to appraise or control the other person's conduct by |
---|
30 | 34 | | administering any substance without the other person's knowledge; |
---|
31 | 35 | | (7) the actor compels the other person to submit or |
---|
32 | 36 | | participate by threatening to use force or violence against any |
---|
33 | 37 | | person, and the other person believes that the actor has the ability |
---|
34 | 38 | | to execute the threat; |
---|
35 | 39 | | (8) the actor is a public servant who coerces the other |
---|
36 | 40 | | person to submit or participate; |
---|
37 | 41 | | (9) the actor is a mental health services provider or a |
---|
38 | 42 | | health care services provider who causes the other person, who is a |
---|
39 | 43 | | patient or former patient of the actor, to submit or participate by |
---|
40 | 44 | | exploiting the other person's emotional dependency on the actor; |
---|
41 | 45 | | (10) the actor is a clergyman who causes the other |
---|
42 | 46 | | person to submit or participate by exploiting the other person's |
---|
43 | 47 | | emotional dependency on the clergyman in the clergyman's |
---|
44 | 48 | | professional character as spiritual adviser; |
---|
45 | 49 | | (11) the actor is an employee of a facility where the |
---|
46 | 50 | | other person is a resident, unless the employee and resident are |
---|
47 | 51 | | formally or informally married to each other under Chapter 2, |
---|
48 | 52 | | Family Code; [or] |
---|
49 | 53 | | (12) the actor is a health care services provider who, |
---|
50 | 54 | | in the course of performing an assisted reproduction procedure on |
---|
51 | 55 | | the other person, uses human reproductive material from a donor |
---|
52 | 56 | | knowing that the other person has not expressly consented to the use |
---|
53 | 57 | | of material from that donor; |
---|
58 | 68 | | person with activities of daily life and causes the other person to |
---|
59 | 69 | | submit or participate by exploiting the other person's dependency |
---|
60 | 70 | | on the actor. |
---|
61 | 71 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
62 | 72 | | to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
63 | 73 | | An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
64 | 74 | | governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, |
---|
65 | 75 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For |
---|
66 | 76 | | purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the |
---|
67 | 77 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred |
---|
68 | 78 | | before that date. |
---|
69 | 79 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
70 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
71 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
72 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1164 passed the Senate on |
---|
73 | | - | April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
74 | | - | May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
75 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House |
---|
76 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
77 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
78 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
79 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
81 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1164 passed the House, with |
---|
82 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, |
---|
83 | | - | Nays 0, one present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request |
---|
84 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
85 | | - | May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
86 | | - | following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
87 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
88 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
89 | | - | Approved: |
---|
90 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | | - | Date |
---|
92 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
93 | | - | Governor |
---|