Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021