Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1315 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 1315


 AN ACT
 relating to the determination that certain property is used as an
 aid or facility incidental to or useful in the operation or
 development of a port or waterway or in aid of navigation-related
 commerce for purposes of the application of certain ad valorem tax
 laws.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.07, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  For purposes of Subsection (b)(6)(B) of this section,
 property is used as an aid or facility incidental to or useful in
 the operation or development of a port or waterway or in aid of
 navigation-related commerce if the property:
 (1)  is leased to a person:
 (A)  engaged in the business of
 navigation-related commerce; or
 (B)  for a purpose described by Section 60.101,
 61.162, or 63.153, Water Code, or for the placement on the property
 of an improvement described by those sections;
 (2)  is located:
 (A)  adjacent to a federal navigation project; or
 (B)  in a foreign trade zone established and
 operated under federal law; or
 (3)  includes part of a rail facility that serves the
 tenants and users of the port or waterway.
 (e)  In this section, "navigation-related commerce" includes
 the following if engaged in by a person:
 (1)  an activity that requires the person to hold a
 maritime-related license or permit issued by a navigation district,
 including providing stevedoring, steamship agency, towing,
 tugboat, or line handling services;
 (2)  an activity that requires the person to hold a
 franchise issued by a navigation district;
 (3)  possessing a leasehold interest in property owned
 by a navigation district that connects infrastructure to a public
 dock;
 (4)  hauling cargo into or across a public dock;
 (5)  commercial fishing;
 (6)  constructing, fabricating, cleaning, repairing,
 dismantling, or recycling vessels;
 (7)  pilotage; or
 (8)  an activity described by Section 60.101, 61.162,
 or 63.153, Water Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to the taxation of property
 for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1315 passed the Senate on
 April 27, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2;
 May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29,
 Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1315 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 135,
 Nays 10, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 106, Nays 33, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor