4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to the determination that certain property is used as an |
---|
6 | 8 | | aid or facility incidental to or useful in the operation or |
---|
7 | 9 | | development of a port or waterway or in aid of navigation-related |
---|
8 | 10 | | commerce for purposes of the application of certain ad valorem tax |
---|
9 | 11 | | laws. |
---|
10 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 25.07, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
12 | 14 | | Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 15 | | (d) For purposes of Subsection (b)(6)(B) of this section, |
---|
14 | 16 | | property is used as an aid or facility incidental to or useful in |
---|
15 | 17 | | the operation or development of a port or waterway or in aid of |
---|
16 | 18 | | navigation-related commerce if the property: |
---|
17 | 19 | | (1) is leased to a person: |
---|
18 | 20 | | (A) engaged in the business of |
---|
19 | 21 | | navigation-related commerce; or |
---|
20 | 22 | | (B) for a purpose described by Section 60.101, |
---|
21 | 23 | | 61.162, or 63.153, Water Code, or for the placement on the property |
---|
22 | 24 | | of an improvement described by those sections; |
---|
23 | 25 | | (2) is located: |
---|
24 | 26 | | (A) adjacent to a federal navigation project; or |
---|
25 | 27 | | (B) in a foreign trade zone established and |
---|
26 | 28 | | operated under federal law; or |
---|
27 | 29 | | (3) includes part of a rail facility that serves the |
---|
28 | 30 | | tenants and users of the port or waterway. |
---|
29 | 31 | | (e) In this section, "navigation-related commerce" includes |
---|
30 | 32 | | the following if engaged in by a person: |
---|
31 | 33 | | (1) an activity that requires the person to hold a |
---|
32 | 34 | | maritime-related license or permit issued by a navigation district, |
---|
33 | 35 | | including providing stevedoring, steamship agency, towing, |
---|
34 | 36 | | tugboat, or line handling services; |
---|
35 | 37 | | (2) an activity that requires the person to hold a |
---|
36 | 38 | | franchise issued by a navigation district; |
---|
37 | 39 | | (3) possessing a leasehold interest in property owned |
---|
38 | 40 | | by a navigation district that connects infrastructure to a public |
---|
39 | 41 | | dock; |
---|
40 | 42 | | (4) hauling cargo into or across a public dock; |
---|
41 | 43 | | (5) commercial fishing; |
---|
42 | 44 | | (6) constructing, fabricating, cleaning, repairing, |
---|
43 | 45 | | dismantling, or recycling vessels; |
---|
44 | 46 | | (7) pilotage; or |
---|
45 | 47 | | (8) an activity described by Section 60.101, 61.162, |
---|
46 | 48 | | or 63.153, Water Code. |
---|
47 | 49 | | SECTION 2. This Act applies only to the taxation of property |
---|
48 | 50 | | for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
49 | 51 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1315 passed the Senate on |
---|
53 | | - | April 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; |
---|
54 | | - | May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
55 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House |
---|
56 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
57 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 29, |
---|
58 | | - | Nays 2. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
61 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1315 passed the House, with |
---|
62 | | - | amendments, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135, |
---|
63 | | - | Nays 10, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted |
---|
64 | | - | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
65 | | - | May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
66 | | - | following vote: Yeas 106, Nays 33, two present not voting. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
69 | | - | Approved: |
---|
70 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
71 | | - | Date |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Governor |
---|