05/18/2021 | Effective immediately | |||
05/18/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/06/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/06/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Record vote RV#721 | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2843 | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |