Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021