Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1351 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021