Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1351 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1351


 AN ACT
 relating to the donation of food by public school campuses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.907, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 allow a campus to elect to donate food to a nonprofit organization
 through a person [an official of the nonprofit organization] who is
 directly and officially affiliated with the campus, including a
 teacher or[,] counselor, or through a parent of a student enrolled
 at the campus. The donated food may be received, stored, and
 distributed on the campus. Food donated by the campus may include:
 (1)  surplus food prepared for breakfast, lunch, or
 dinner meals or snacks [a snack to be] served from [at] the campus
 cafeteria, subject to any applicable local, state, and federal
 requirements; or
 (2)  food donated to the campus as the result of a food
 drive or similar event.
 (c)  The type of food donated under Subsection (b)(1) [this
 section] may include:
 (1)  packaged [or unpackaged] unserved food that is
 packaged on the campus of a school district or open-enrollment
 charter school and has not been removed from the campus cafeteria;
 (2)  packaged served food if the packaging and food are
 [is] in good condition;
 (3)  whole, uncut produce; and
 (4)  wrapped raw unserved produce[; and
 [(5)  unpeeled fruit required to be peeled before
 consumption].
 (c-1)  Food that by law must be maintained at a certain
 temperature for safety may not be donated unless the campus has
 maintained the food at the required temperature.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1351 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1351 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 123,
 Nays 24, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor