Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021