4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to regional protocols and processes for patient transfers |
---|
6 | 10 | | and related services within the geographic area served by certain |
---|
7 | 11 | | trauma service area regional advisory councils. |
---|
8 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety |
---|
10 | 14 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 773.1141 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 15 | | Sec. 773.1141. INFORMATION, GUIDELINES, AND PROTOCOLS |
---|
12 | 16 | | RELATED TO CERTAIN PATIENT TRANSFERS AND RELATED SERVICES. (a) |
---|
13 | 17 | | This section applies only to a trauma service area regional |
---|
14 | 18 | | advisory council serving a geographic area that includes: |
---|
15 | 19 | | (1) at least one county located on the international |
---|
16 | 20 | | border of this state; and |
---|
17 | 21 | | (2) at least one county adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico. |
---|
18 | 22 | | (b) For each trauma service area regional advisory council to |
---|
19 | 23 | | which this section applies, the executive commissioner by rule |
---|
20 | 24 | | shall: |
---|
21 | 25 | | (1) require the council to create an advisory committee |
---|
22 | 26 | | composed of equally represented designated trauma hospital system |
---|
23 | 27 | | members located within the geographic boundaries of the council or |
---|
24 | 28 | | require the council to direct an existing advisory committee of the |
---|
25 | 29 | | council established for a purpose similar to that described by this |
---|
26 | 30 | | subsection to: |
---|
27 | 31 | | (A) develop guidelines for patient transfers; and |
---|
28 | 32 | | (B) periodically review patient transfers to |
---|
29 | 33 | | ensure compliance with applicable guidelines; |
---|
30 | 34 | | (2) for the purpose of ensuring that patients located |
---|
31 | 35 | | in the council's geographic boundaries receive health care at the |
---|
32 | 36 | | health care facility closest to and most appropriate for the |
---|
33 | 37 | | patients, require the council to develop regional protocols and |
---|
34 | 38 | | processes to assist the council in managing the dispatch, triage, |
---|
35 | 39 | | transport, and transfer of patients; and |
---|
36 | 40 | | (3) require each hospital and emergency medical |
---|
37 | 41 | | services provider operating within the council's geographic |
---|
38 | 42 | | boundaries to collect and report to the council data on patients |
---|
39 | 43 | | transferred outside the council's geographic boundaries. |
---|
40 | 44 | | SECTION 2. Not later than April 1, 2022, the executive |
---|
41 | 45 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
42 | 46 | | adopt the rules required by Section 773.1141, Health and Safety |
---|
43 | 47 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
44 | 48 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
45 | 49 | | a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, as |
---|
46 | 50 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
47 | 51 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
48 | 52 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1397 passed the Senate on |
---|
52 | | - | April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
53 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the |
---|
54 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
55 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
57 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1397 passed the House, with |
---|
58 | | - | amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 113, |
---|
59 | | - | Nays 34, two present not voting. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
62 | | - | Approved: |
---|
63 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|