Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1397 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 1397


 AN ACT
 relating to regional protocols and processes for patient transfers
 and related services within the geographic area served by certain
 trauma service area regional advisory councils.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 773.1141 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.1141.  INFORMATION, GUIDELINES, AND PROTOCOLS
 RELATED TO CERTAIN PATIENT TRANSFERS AND RELATED SERVICES.  (a)
 This section applies only to a trauma service area regional
 advisory council serving a geographic area that includes:
 (1)  at least one county located on the international
 border of this state; and
 (2) at least one county adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico.
 (b) For each trauma service area regional advisory council to
 which this section applies, the executive commissioner by rule
 shall:
 (1) require the council to create an advisory committee
 composed of equally represented designated trauma hospital system
 members located within the geographic boundaries of the council or
 require the council to direct an existing advisory committee of the
 council established for a purpose similar to that described by this
 subsection to:
 (A) develop guidelines for patient transfers; and
 (B) periodically review patient transfers to
 ensure compliance with applicable guidelines;
 (2) for the purpose of ensuring that patients located
 in the council's geographic boundaries receive health care at the
 health care facility closest to and most appropriate for the
 patients, require the council to develop regional protocols and
 processes to assist the council in managing the dispatch, triage,
 transport, and transfer of patients; and
 (3) require each hospital and emergency medical
 services provider operating within the council's geographic
 boundaries to collect and report to the council data on patients
 transferred outside the council's geographic boundaries.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than April 1, 2022, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 773.1141, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1397 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1397 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 113,
 Nays 34, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor